HI HR111 | 2018 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HR111
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 9 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-28 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Souki excused (1).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 9 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-28 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Souki excused (1).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Encouraging The U.s. Army And U.s. Navy To Nominate Kolekole Pass To The Theater Engineer Effects Board To Be Repaired For Use By The Military And As An Evacuation Route In The Event Of An Emergency Or Natural Disaster On The Leeward Coast.
Title
Encouraging The U.s. Army And U.s. Navy To Nominate Kolekole Pass To The Theater Engineer Effects Board To Be Repaired For Use By The Military And As An Evacuation Route In The Event Of An Emergency Or Natural Disaster On The Leeward Coast.
Sponsors
Rep. Andria Tupola [R] | Rep. Cedric Gates [D] | Rep. Sam Kong [D] | Rep. Cynthia Thielen [R] |
Rep. James Tokioka [D] | Rep. Lynn Decoite [D] | Rep. Bob McDermott [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-28 | House | Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Souki excused (1). |
2018-03-28 | House | Reported from PBS/VMI (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1663-18), recommending referral to FIN. |
2018-03-22 | House | The committees on VMI recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) LoPresti, Cachola, Ito, Ohno, Onishi, Tokioka, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Fukumoto, Choy, Woodson. |
2018-03-22 | House | The committees on PBS recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Takayama, Gates, Creagan, DeCoite, Say; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Ing, Thielen. |
2018-03-19 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by PBS/VMI on Thursday, 03-22-18 9:30AM in conference room 312. |
2018-03-13 | House | Referred to PBS/VMI, FIN, referral sheet 39 |
2018-03-09 | House | Offered |
Same As/Similar To
HR111 (Carry Over) 2017-03-14 - Referred to HED, FIN, referral sheet 30
HCR161 (Same As) 2018-03-28 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Souki excused (1).
HCR161 (Same As) 2018-03-28 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Souki excused (1).
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HR&billnumber=111&year=2018 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2018/bills/HR111_.HTM |