HI HR114 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Passed on April 1 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-01 - (H) Resolution adopted in final form.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Passed on April 1 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-01 - (H) Resolution adopted in final form.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting All Active, Reserve, And Guard Components Of The United States Military And The Active And Reserve Components Of The United States Coast Guard To Make Resources Available To Improve The Opportunities For Continual Care For The Domestic Animals Owned By Members Of The United States Military And United States Coast Guard Who Are Required To Deploy Or Relocate.
Title
Domestic Animals; Armed Forces; Deployment
Sponsors
Sen. Henry Aquino [D] | Rep. Ty Cullen [D] | Rep. Aaron Johanson [D] | Rep. Blake Oshiro [D] |
Rep. Marcus Oshiro [D] | Rep. Cynthia Thielen [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-01 | (H) Resolution adopted in final form. | |
2011-04-01 | (H) Adopted with none voting no and Belatti, Say, Takumi, Tokioka, Wooley excused. | |
2011-04-01 | (H) Reported from PBM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1296), recommending adoption. | |
2011-03-24 | (H) The committees on PBM recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Aquino, Cullen, Ichiyama, M. Lee, Takai, Takumi, Yamashita, Fontaine, Johanson; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Luke, Saiki, Souki. | |
2011-03-22 | (H) Resolution scheduled to be heard by PBM on Thursday, 03-24-11 10:30AM in conference room 309. | |
2011-03-16 | (H) Referred to PBM, referral sheet 39 | |
2011-03-15 | (H) Offered | |
2011-03-14 | (H) To be offered. |
Same As/Similar To
HCR134 (Same As) 2011-04-18 - (H) Resolution adopted in final form.
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2011/lists/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HR&billnumber=114 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2011/Bills/HR114_.HTM |