HI HR116 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 13 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-13 - (H) Resolution adopted in final form.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 13 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-13 - (H) Resolution adopted in final form.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The Department Of Transportation And The City And County Of Honolulu To Inspect, Clean, And Fix The Drainage System In East Honolulu.
Title
Drainage; Sewage; East Honolulu; Flooding
Sponsors
Rep. Mark Hashem [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-13 | (H) Resolution adopted in final form. | |
2012-04-13 | (H) Adopted with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Chang, Kawakami, Oshiro, Tokioka excused (4). | |
2012-04-13 | (H) Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1763-12), recommending adoption. | |
2012-04-11 | (H) The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Oshiro, M. Lee, Choy, Cullen, Giugni, Har, Hashem, C. Lee, Morikawa, Tokioka, Yamashita, Marumoto, Riviere, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Ichiyama, Jordan, Kawakami. | |
2012-04-09 | (H) Scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 04-11-12 11:15AM in conference room 308. | |
2012-03-30 | (H) Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Carroll, Herkes, Manahan, Wooley excused (4). | |
2012-03-30 | (H) Reported from TRN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1380-12), recommending referral to FIN. | |
2012-03-28 | (H) The committees on TRN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Souki, Ichiyama, Aquino, Cullen, Fontaine, Johanson; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 5 Excused: Representative(s) M. Lee, Luke, Saiki, Takumi, Yamashita. | |
2012-03-22 | (H) Resolution scheduled to be heard by TRN on Wednesday, 03-28-12 10:30AM in conference room 309. | |
2012-03-20 | (H) Referred to TRN, FIN, referral sheet 50 | |
2012-03-14 | (H) Offered |