HI HR116 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Passed on April 4 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-04 - Resolution adopted in final form.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Passed on April 4 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-04 - Resolution adopted in final form.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The Department Of Transportation To Study And Recommend Solutions To Resolve Supply Chain Issues Caused By Barge Delays To Lanai.
Title
Requesting The Department Of Transportation To Study And Recommend Solutions To Resolve Supply Chain Issues Caused By Barge Delays To Lanai.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-04 | House | Resolution adopted in final form. |
2024-04-04 | House | Adopted with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Kitagawa, Quinlan, Souza excused (3). |
2024-04-04 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1657-24), recommending adoption. |
2024-04-02 | House | The committee on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 13 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamashita, Kitagawa, Aiu, Chun, Cochran, Garrett, Kahaloa, Kila, Kobayashi, Lamosao, Poepoe, Takenouchi, Alcos; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Morikawa, Nishimoto, Ward. |
2024-03-28 | House | Scheduled for decision making on Tuesday, 04-02-24 2:15PM in conference room 308 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2024-03-28 | House | Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Gates, Ichiyama, Kila, Lowen, Tam excused (5). |
2024-03-28 | House | Reported from TRN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1502-24), recommending referral to FIN. |
2024-03-21 | House | The committee on TRN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Todd, Kila, Aiu, Evslin, Kitagawa, Miyake, Onishi; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Matsumoto. |
2024-03-15 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by TRN on Thursday, 03-21-24 10:30AM in conference room 312 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2024-03-13 | House | Referred to TRN, FIN, referral sheet 21 |
2024-03-08 | House | Offered |
Same As/Similar To
HCR135 (Same As) 2024-04-05 - Referred to TCA.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HR&billnumber=116&year=2024 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/sessions/session2024/bills/HR116_.HTM |