HI HR12 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Passed on April 7 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-07 - Resolution adopted in final form.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Passed on April 7 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-07 - Resolution adopted in final form.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Urging The Judiciary To Examine The Feasibility And Potential Benefits Of Establishing Dwi Court Programs In Kona And Hilo On Hawaii Island.
Title
DWI Court Program; Hawaii Island; Judiciary
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-07 | House | Resolution adopted in final form. |
2016-04-07 | House | Adopted with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) McDermott, Oshiro, Thielen, Tupola excused (4). |
2016-04-07 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1575-16), recommending adoption. |
2016-04-05 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Cullen, DeCoite, Johanson, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, LoPresti, Lowen, Onishi, Tokioka, Yamashita, Pouha, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Cachola, Jordan. |
2016-04-05 | House | Broadcast of hearing/briefing available. See: www.capitoltv.org |
2016-04-01 | House | Scheduled for decision making on Tuesday, 04-05-16 2:00PM in conference room 308. |
2016-03-23 | House | Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Kawakami, Kong, Pouha excused (3). |
2016-03-23 | House | Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1193-16), recommending referral to FIN. |
2016-03-17 | House | The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) Rhoads, San Buenaventura, Brower, Creagan, Hashem, C. Lee, Nakashima, Takayama, Woodson, McDermott, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Belatti, Kawakami, Morikawa. |
2016-03-11 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by JUD on Thursday, 03-17-16 2:00PM in conference room 325. |
2016-02-23 | House | Referred to JUD, FIN, referral sheet 21 |
2016-02-23 | House | Offered |
2016-02-22 | House | To be offered. |
Same As/Similar To
HCR44 (Same As) 2016-04-19 - Report adopted, referred to WAM.
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HR&billnumber=12&year=2016 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2016/bills/HR12_.HTM |