HI HR120 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on March 8 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-04-02 - The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Consumer Protection & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 8 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-04-02 - The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Consumer Protection & Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The State Building Code Council To Adopt, Amend, Or Update The State Building Code To Authorize Point Access Block Construction For Residential Buildings Up To Six Stories In The State.
Title
Requesting The State Building Code Council To Adopt, Amend, Or Update The State Building Code To Authorize Point Access Block Construction For Residential Buildings Up To Six Stories In The State.
Sponsors
Rep. Luke Evslin [D] | Rep. Terez Amato [D] | Rep. Darius Kila [D] | Rep. Nicole Lowen [D] |
Rep. Tyson Miyake [D] | Rep. Daynette Morikawa [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-02 | House | The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2024-03-28 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by CPC on Tuesday, 04-02-24 2:00PM in conference room 329 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2024-03-27 | House | Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Belatti, Ganaden, Kapela, La Chica, Nakashima, Nishimoto, Sayama, Tam, Todd excused (9). |
2024-03-27 | House | Reported from HSG (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1416-24), recommending referral to CPC. |
2024-03-20 | House | The committee on HSG recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Evslin, Aiu, Kila, Miyake, Onishi, Todd, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Kitagawa. |
2024-03-15 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by HSG on Wednesday, 03-20-24 10:00AM in conference room 312 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2024-03-13 | House | Referred to HSG, CPC, referral sheet 21 |
2024-03-08 | House | Offered |
Same As/Similar To
HCR139 (Same As) 2024-04-02 - The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HR&billnumber=120&year=2024 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/sessions/session2024/bills/HR120_.HTM |