HI HR121 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Passed on April 5 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-05 - Resolution adopted in final form.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Passed on April 5 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-05 - Resolution adopted in final form.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Urging The Committee On Weights To Recommend, And The Board Of Education To Adopt, A Weighted Student Formula That Gives Greater Consideration To Small And Remote Schools.
Title
Urging The Committee On Weights To Recommend, And The Board Of Education To Adopt, A Weighted Student Formula That Gives Greater Consideration To Small And Remote Schools.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-05 | House | Resolution adopted in final form. |
2023-04-05 | House | Adopted with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Nishimoto, Yamashita excused (2). |
2023-04-05 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 2011), recommending adoption. |
2023-04-03 | House | The committee on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 16 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamashita, Kitagawa, Aiu, Chun, Cochran, Garrett, Kahaloa, Kila, Kobayashi, Lamosao, Morikawa, Nishimoto, Poepoe, Takenouchi, Alcos; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Ward; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2023-03-31 | House | Scheduled for decision making on Monday, 04-03-23 2:00PM in conference room 308 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2023-03-30 | House | Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ilagan, Sayama, Woodson excused (3). |
2023-03-30 | House | Reported from EDN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1683), recommending referral to FIN. |
2023-03-23 | House | The committee on EDN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Woodson, Marten, Evslin, Kapela, La Chica, Matayoshi, Perruso, Quinlan; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Martinez, Todd, Garcia. |
2023-03-21 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by EDN on Thursday, 03-23-23 2:00PM in conference room 309 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2023-03-15 | House | Referred to EDN, FIN, referral sheet 20 |
2023-03-10 | House | Offered |
Same As/Similar To
HCR116 (Same As) 2023-05-04 - Received notice of Agreement and Adoption in House (Hse. Com. No. 898).
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HR&billnumber=121&year=2023 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/sessions/session2023/bills/HR121_.HTM |