HI HR139 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-5)
Status: Passed on April 13 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-13 - (H) Resolution adopted in final form.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-5)
Status: Passed on April 13 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-13 - (H) Resolution adopted in final form.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting A Report Of All State Department Expenditures Relating To Energy Conservation Contracts And Power Purchase Agreements.
Title
Reports; State agencies
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-13 | (H) Resolution adopted in final form. | |
2012-04-13 | (H) Adopted with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Chang, Kawakami, Oshiro, Tokioka excused (4). | |
2012-04-13 | (H) Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1751-12), recommending adoption. | |
2012-04-11 | (H) The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Oshiro, M. Lee, Choy, Cullen, Giugni, Har, Hashem, C. Lee, Morikawa, Tokioka, Yamashita, Marumoto, Riviere, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Ichiyama, Jordan, Kawakami. | |
2012-04-09 | (H) Scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 04-11-12 11:15AM in conference room 308. | |
2012-04-03 | (H) Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Cabanilla, Carroll, Mizuno, Thielen excused (4). | |
2012-04-03 | (H) Reported from LMG (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1452-12) as amended in HD 1, recommending referral to FIN. | |
2012-03-30 | (H) The committees on LMG recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 3 Ayes: Yamashita, Tokioka, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Manahan. | |
2012-03-27 | (H) Resolution scheduled to be heard by LMG on Friday, 03-30-12 2:00PM in conference room 423. | |
2012-03-20 | (H) Referred to LMG, FIN, referral sheet 50 | |
2012-03-14 | (H) Offered |
Same As/Similar To
HCR178 (Same As) 2012-04-27 - (S) Received notice of Adoption in House (Hse. Com. No. 705).
SCR146 (Same As) 2012-03-16 - (S) Referred to PGM, WAM.
SR81 (Same As) 2012-03-16 - (S) Referred to PGM, WAM.
SCR146 (Same As) 2012-03-16 - (S) Referred to PGM, WAM.
SR81 (Same As) 2012-03-16 - (S) Referred to PGM, WAM.