HI HR142 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on April 7 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-07 - Resolution adopted in final form.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on April 7 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-07 - Resolution adopted in final form.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The State Procurement Office To Review Hawaii's Procurement Laws In Comparison With Federal Procurement Laws.
Title
Procurement; Review
Sponsors
Rep. Kyle Yamashita [D] | Rep. Mark Hashem [D] | Rep. Ken Ito [D] | Rep. Ryan Yamane [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-07 | House | Resolution adopted in final form. |
2016-04-07 | House | Adopted with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) McDermott, Oshiro, Thielen, Tupola excused (4). |
2016-04-07 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1559-16), recommending adoption. |
2016-04-05 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 16 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Cachola, Cullen, DeCoite, Johanson, Jordan, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, LoPresti, Lowen, Onishi, Tokioka, Yamashita, Pouha, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2016-04-05 | House | Broadcast of hearing/briefing available. See: www.capitoltv.org |
2016-04-01 | House | Scheduled for decision making on Tuesday, 04-05-16 2:00PM in conference room 308. |
2016-03-28 | House | Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Kong, Lowen, Matsumoto, McKelvey, Oshiro, Saiki excused (6). |
2016-03-28 | House | Reported from EDB (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1347-16), recommending referral to FIN. |
2016-03-17 | House | The committees on EDB recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 13 Ayes: Representative(s) Kawakami, Brower, Cachola, Choy, DeCoite, Ito, Ohno, Onishi, Tokioka, Tsuji, Woodson, Matsumoto, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Kong. |
2016-03-14 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by EDB on Thursday, 03-17-16 10:00AM in conference room 312. |
2016-03-14 | House | Referred to EDB, FIN, referral sheet 28 |
2016-03-11 | House | Offered |
Same As/Similar To
HCR196 (Same As) 2016-04-08 - Referred to GVO.
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HR&billnumber=142&year=2016 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2016/bills/HR142_.HTM |