HI HR149 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 13 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-08 - The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 13 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-04-08 - The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting A Convening Of A Mental Health Access Working Group.
Title
Mental Health Access Working Group
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-08 | House | The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2015-04-06 | House | Bill scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 04-08-15 2:00PM in conference room 325. |
2015-04-06 | House | The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 04-08-15. |
2015-04-02 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by CPC on Monday, 04-06-15 2:30PM in conference room 325. |
2015-03-31 | House | Re-referred to HLT, CPC, referral sheet 44 |
2015-03-24 | House | Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on HED as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Har, Ing, Takumi excused (3). |
2015-03-24 | House | Reported from HLT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1064) as amended in HD 1, recommending referral to HED. |
2015-03-20 | House | The committees on HLT recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Belatti, Creagan, Hashem, Kobayashi, Morikawa, Oshiro; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Jordan, Fukumoto Chang, Tupola. |
2015-03-18 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by HLT on Friday, 03-20-15 8:45AM in conference room 329. |
2015-03-16 | House | Referred to HLT, HED, CPC, referral sheet 33 |
2015-03-13 | House | Offered |
Same As/Similar To
HCR214 (Same As) 2015-04-08 - The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.