HI HR152 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HR152
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on March 12 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-23 - Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) McDermott excused (1).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 12 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-23 - Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) McDermott excused (1).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The Convening Of A Creative Resurgence Task Force To Build And Foster Creativity And Innovation Through The Arts, Culture, And Humanities.
Title
Requesting The Convening Of A Creative Resurgence Task Force To Build And Foster Creativity And Innovation Through The Arts, Culture, And Humanities.
Sponsors
Rep. Cedric Gates [D] | Rep. Della au Belatti [D] | Rep. Patrick Branco [D] | Rep. Dale Kobayashi [D] |
Rep. John Mizuno [D] | Rep. Nadine Nakamura [D] | Rep. Adrian Tam [D] | Rep. Justin Woodson [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-03-17 - House - House Culture, Arts, & International Affairs: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-23 | House | Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) McDermott excused (1). |
2021-03-23 | House | Reported from CAI (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1168) as amended in HD 1, recommending referral to FIN. |
2021-03-17 | House | The committees on CAI recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Gates, LoPresti, Har, Kapela, Nishimoto, Tam, Yamane, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2021-03-16 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by CAI on Wednesday, 03-17-21 9:30AM in conference room 329 Via Videoconference. |
2021-03-15 | House | Referred to CAI, FIN, referral sheet 25 |
2021-03-12 | House | Offered |
Same As/Similar To
HR152 (Carry Over) 2021-03-23 - Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) McDermott excused (1).
HCR183 (Same As) 2021-03-23 - Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) McDermott excused (1).
HCR183 (Same As) 2021-03-23 - Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) McDermott excused (1).