HI HR154 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HR154
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Introduced on March 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-28 - Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on JUD as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cabanilla Arakawa, C. Lee excused (2).
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-28 - Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on JUD as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cabanilla Arakawa, C. Lee excused (2).
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The State Commission On The Status Of Women To Maintain A Database On Sex Trafficking Offenses.
Title
Requesting The State Commission On The Status Of Women To Maintain A Database On Sex Trafficking Offenses.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-28 | House | Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on JUD as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cabanilla Arakawa, C. Lee excused (2). |
2019-03-28 | House | Reported from HSH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1878) as amended in HD 1, recommending referral to JUD. |
2019-03-22 | House | The committees on HSH recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) San Buenaventura, Nakamura, Belatti, B. Kobayashi, Mizuno, Say, Tokioka, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2019-03-19 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by HSH on Friday, 03-22-19 8:30AM in conference room 329. |
2019-03-14 | House | Referred to HSH, JUD, referral sheet 33 |
2019-03-08 | House | Offered |
Same As/Similar To
HR154 (Carry Over) 2019-03-28 - Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on JUD as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cabanilla Arakawa, C. Lee excused (2).
HCR175 (Same As) 2019-04-22 - Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 940) in amended form (SD 1).
HCR175 (Same As) 2019-04-22 - Returned from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 940) in amended form (SD 1).