HI HR157 | 2018 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HR157
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-4)
Status: Introduced on March 9 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-28 - Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Souki excused (1).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 9 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-28 - Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Souki excused (1).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Urging The Department Of Hawaiian Home Lands To Commit To Providing Housing First For Native Hawaiian Beneficiaries.
Title
Urging The Department Of Hawaiian Home Lands To Commit To Providing Housing First For Native Hawaiian Beneficiaries.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-28 | House | Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Souki excused (1). |
2018-03-28 | House | Reported from HSG/OMH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1632-18) as amended in HD 1, recommending referral to FIN. |
2018-03-20 | House | The committees on OMH recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) DeCoite, Creagan, Say, Takayama, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Ing, Gates. |
2018-03-20 | House | The committees on HSG recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Brower, Nakamura, Aquino, Hashem, San Buenaventura; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Quinlan, McDermott. |
2018-03-16 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by HSG/OMH on Tuesday, 03-20-18 10:15AM in conference room 423. |
2018-03-13 | House | Referred to HSG/OMH, FIN, referral sheet 39 |
2018-03-09 | House | Offered |
Same As/Similar To
HR157 (Carry Over) 2017-04-03 - Resolution adopted in final form.