HI HR157 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-0)
Status: Introduced on March 10 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-03-29 - The committee(s) on LGO recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Labor & Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 10 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-03-29 - The committee(s) on LGO recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Labor & Government Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The Various State Departments To Reexamine Their Work From Home Policies To Allow Greater Flexibility To Work From Home.
Title
Requesting The Various State Departments To Reexamine Their Work From Home Policies To Allow Greater Flexibility To Work From Home.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-29 | House | The committee(s) on LGO recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2023-03-23 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by LGO on Wednesday, 03-29-23 10:00AM in conference room 309 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2023-03-15 | House | Referred to LGO, referral sheet 20 |
2023-03-10 | House | Offered |
Same As/Similar To
HCR156 (Same As) 2023-03-29 - The committee(s) on LGO recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HR&billnumber=157&year=2023 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/sessions/session2023/bills/HR157_.HTM |