HI HR158 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HR158
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on March 11 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-14 - Referred to CAI, JHA, referral sheet 27
Pending: House Culture, Arts, & International Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 11 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-14 - Referred to CAI, JHA, referral sheet 27
Pending: House Culture, Arts, & International Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Denouncing Russia's Actions Causing A Humanitarian Crisis In Ukraine And Urging The United States Congress To Take Concrete Action To Support Ukrainian Refugees And To Increase The Refugee Limits For The United States And Increase Funding Related To Those Efforts.
Title
Denouncing Russia's Actions Causing A Humanitarian Crisis In Ukraine And Urging The United States Congress To Take Concrete Action To Support Ukrainian Refugees And To Increase The Refugee Limits For The United States And Increase Funding Related To Those Efforts.
Sponsors
Rep. Cedric Gates [D] | Rep. Della au Belatti [D] | Rep. Patrick Branco [D] | Rep. Lisa Marten [D] |
Rep. Scot Matayoshi [D] | Rep. Takashi Ohno [D] | Rep. Adrian Tam [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-14 | House | Referred to CAI, JHA, referral sheet 27 |
2022-03-11 | House | Offered |
Same As/Similar To
HCR158 (Same As) 2022-03-14 - Referred to CAI, JHA, referral sheet 27
HR158 (Carry Over) 2021-03-31 - Resolution adopted in final form.
SCR185 (Same As) 2022-06-06 - Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06/06/22.
HR158 (Carry Over) 2021-03-31 - Resolution adopted in final form.
SCR185 (Same As) 2022-06-06 - Certified copies of resolutions sent, 06/06/22.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HR&billnumber=158&year=2022 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2022/bills/HR158_.HTM |