HI HR164 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 4 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-04 - Resolution adopted in final form.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 4 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-04 - Resolution adopted in final form.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The Department Of Business, Economic Development, And Tourism To Collaborate With Universities In The State To Convene The Hawaii Creative Innovation Group.
Title
Requesting The Department Of Business, Economic Development, And Tourism To Collaborate With Universities In The State To Convene The Hawaii Creative Innovation Group.
Sponsors
Rep. Daniel Holt [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-04 | House | Resolution adopted in final form. |
2024-04-04 | House | Adopted with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Kitagawa, Quinlan, Souza excused (3). |
2024-04-04 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1639-24), recommending adoption. |
2024-04-02 | House | The committee on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 13 Ayes: Representative(s) Yamashita, Kitagawa, Aiu, Chun, Cochran, Garrett, Kahaloa, Kila, Kobayashi, Lamosao, Poepoe, Takenouchi, Alcos; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Morikawa, Nishimoto, Ward. |
2024-03-28 | House | Scheduled for decision making on Tuesday, 04-02-24 2:15PM in conference room 308 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2024-03-28 | House | Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Gates, Ichiyama, Kila, Lowen, Tam excused (5). |
2024-03-28 | House | Reported from ECD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1521-24), recommending referral to FIN. |
2024-03-22 | House | The committee on ECD recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Holt, Lamosao, Kong, La Chica, Nakamura, Pierick; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Hussey-Burdick, Quinlan. |
2024-03-19 | House | Resolution re-scheduled to be heard by ECD on Friday, 03-22-24 11:00AM in conference room 423 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2024-03-18 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by ECD on Friday, 03-22-24 11:00AM in conference room 325 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2024-03-14 | House | Referred to ECD, FIN, referral sheet 22 |
2024-03-08 | House | Offered |
Same As/Similar To
HCR184 (Same As) 2024-04-22 - Resolution adopted in final form.
Subjects
Creative
Department of Business, Economic Development, and Tourism
Film
Hawaii Creative Innovation Group
Industry
Media
Report
Department of Business, Economic Development, and Tourism
Film
Hawaii Creative Innovation Group
Industry
Media
Report
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HR&billnumber=164&year=2024 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/sessions/session2024/bills/HR164_.HTM |