HI HR169 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-0)
Status: Passed on April 5 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-05 - Resolution adopted in final form.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-0)
Status: Passed on April 5 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-05 - Resolution adopted in final form.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting That The Hawaii State Department Of Education Report To The Legislature On Its Compliance With The Patsy Mink Equal Opportunity In Education Act And The Resolution Agreement Between The Hawaii State Department Of Education And The United States Department Of Education Office For Civil Rights Dated December 20, 2017.
Title
Requesting That The Hawaii State Department Of Education Report To The Legislature On Its Compliance With The Patsy Mink Equal Opportunity In Education Act And The Resolution Agreement Between The Hawaii State Department Of Education And The United States Department Of Education Office For Civil Rights Dated December 20, 2017.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-05 | House | Resolution adopted in final form. |
2018-04-05 | House | Adopted with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Choy, Holt, C. Lee, LoPresti, Nakashima, Quinlan excused (6). |
2018-04-05 | House | Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1828-18), recommending adoption. |
2018-04-04 | House | The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Nishimoto, San Buenaventura, Brower, Morikawa, Takayama, McDermott, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) C. Lee. |
2018-04-02 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by JUD on Wednesday, 04-04-18 2:30PM in conference room 325. |
2018-03-28 | House | Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Souki excused (1). |
2018-03-28 | House | Reported from EDN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1559-18), recommending referral to JUD. |
2018-03-16 | House | The committees on EDN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Woodson, Kong, Hashem, Learmont, Ohno, Onishi, Quinlan; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 4 Excused: Representative(s) Creagan, Ing, McKelvey, Matsumoto. |
2018-03-14 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by EDN on Friday, 03-16-18 2:10PM in conference room 309. |
2018-03-13 | House | Referred to EDN, JUD, referral sheet 39 |
2018-03-09 | House | Offered |
Same As/Similar To
HCR198 (Same As) 2018-04-25 - Resolution adopted in final form.
Subjects
DOE
Gender Equality
School Sports
Title IX, Patsy T. Mink Equal Opportunity in Education Act
U.S. Department of Education Office of Civil Rights
Gender Equality
School Sports
Title IX, Patsy T. Mink Equal Opportunity in Education Act
U.S. Department of Education Office of Civil Rights
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HR&billnumber=169&year=2018 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2018/bills/HR169_.HTM |