HI HR170 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on April 27 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-27 - (H) Resolution adopted in final form.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on April 27 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-27 - (H) Resolution adopted in final form.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Supporting The Workforce Pipeline Program Of The Thirty Meter Telescope Project.
Title
Thirty Meter Telescope Observatory; Workforce Pipeline Program
Sponsors
Rep. Jerry Chang [D] | Rep. Denny Coffman [D] | Rep. Cindy Evans [D] | Rep. Faye Hanohano [D] |
Rep. Robert Herkes [D] | Rep. Mark Nakashima [D] | Rep. Clift Tsuji [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-27 | (H) Resolution adopted in final form. | |
2011-04-27 | (H) Adopted with none voting no and Representative(s) Cabanilla, Carroll, M. Oshiro excused. | |
2011-04-27 | (H) Reconsideration of action taken on 3-29-11 | |
2011-04-25 | (H) Re-referred to HED, referral sheet 68 | |
2011-03-29 | (H) Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on ERB/LAB with none voting no and Har, M. Oshiro excused. | |
2011-03-29 | (H) Reported from HED (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1231), recommending referral to ERB/LAB. | |
2011-03-24 | (H) The committees on HED recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Nishimoto, Nakashima, Aquino, Belatti, Chang, Saiki, Takai, Takumi, Johanson; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 5 Excused: Representative(s) Awana, Hanohano, Mizuno, Wooley, Ching. | |
2011-03-22 | (H) Resolution scheduled to be heard by HED on Thursday, 03-24-11 2:00PM in House conference room 309. | |
2011-03-21 | (H) Referred to HED, ERB/LAB, FIN, referral sheet 43 | |
2011-03-16 | (H) Offered |
Same As/Similar To
HCR197 (Same As) 2011-03-29 - (H) Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on ERB/LAB with none voting no and Har, M. Oshiro excused.
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2011/lists/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HR&billnumber=170 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2011/Bills/HR170_.HTM |