HI HR182 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HR182
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Introduced on March 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-28 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cabanilla Arakawa, C. Lee excused (2).
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 8 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-28 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cabanilla Arakawa, C. Lee excused (2).
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Declaring April As Child Abuse Prevention Month.
Title
Declaring April As Child Abuse Prevention Month.
Sponsors
Rep. Tom Brower [D] | Rep. Romy Cachola [D] | Rep. Richard Creagan [D] | Sen. Angus McKelvey [D] |
Rep. John Mizuno [D] | Rep. Nadine Nakamura [D] | Rep. Calvin Say [D] | Rep. Gene Ward [R] |
Sen. Joy San Buenaventura [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-28 | House | Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cabanilla Arakawa, C. Lee excused (2). |
2019-03-28 | House | Reported from HSH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1890), recommending referral to JUD. |
2019-03-22 | House | The committees on HSH recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) San Buenaventura, Nakamura, Belatti, B. Kobayashi, Mizuno, Say, Tokioka, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2019-03-19 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by HSH on Friday, 03-22-19 8:30AM in conference room 329. |
2019-03-14 | House | Referred to HSH, JUD, referral sheet 33 |
2019-03-08 | House | Offered |
Same As/Similar To
HR182 (Carry Over) 2019-03-28 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cabanilla Arakawa, C. Lee excused (2).
HCR202 (Same As) 2019-04-22 - Resolution adopted in final form.
HCR202 (Same As) 2019-04-22 - Resolution adopted in final form.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HR&billnumber=182&year=2019 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2019/bills/HR182_.HTM |