HI HR182 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Passed on March 29 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-29 - Resolution adopted in final form.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Passed on March 29 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-29 - Resolution adopted in final form.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The Department Of Land And Natural Resources To Conduct Public Forums To Solicit Input From The Community Regarding The Lease Of State Lands To The Military.
Title
Requesting The Department Of Land And Natural Resources To Conduct Public Forums To Solicit Input From The Community Regarding The Lease Of State Lands To The Military.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-23 - House - House Corrections, Military, & Veterans: Passed, Unamended (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-29 | House | Resolution adopted in final form. |
2022-03-29 | House | Adopted with Representative(s) Branco, Holt, Tokioka, Ward voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Eli, Todd, Woodson, Yamane excused (4). |
2022-03-29 | House | Reported from CMV (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1528-22), recommending adoption. |
2022-03-23 | House | The committees on CMV recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Ohno, Ganaden, B. Kobayashi; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Branco, Morikawa, Tarnas; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Kong, McDermott. |
2022-03-22 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by CMV on Wednesday, 03-23-22 10:30AM in conference room 430 Via Videoconference. |
2022-03-14 | House | Referred to CMV, referral sheet 27 |
2022-03-11 | House | Offered |