HI HR185 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on April 4 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-04 - Resolution adopted in final form.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on April 4 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-04 - Resolution adopted in final form.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Urging The University Of Hawaii To Adopt And Publicize A Statewide Equity Statement.
Title
Urging The University Of Hawaii To Adopt And Publicize A Statewide Equity Statement.
Sponsors
Rep. Amy Perruso [D] | Rep. Terez Amato [D] | Rep. Della au Belatti [D] | Rep. Ernesto Ganaden [D] |
Rep. Jeanne Kapela [D] | Rep. Rose Martinez [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-04 | House | Resolution adopted in final form. |
2024-04-04 | House | Adopted with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Garcia, Ward voting no (2) and Representative(s) Kitagawa, Quinlan, Souza excused (3). |
2024-04-04 | House | Reported from JHA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1724-24), recommending adoption. |
2024-04-02 | House | The committee on JHA recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Tarnas, Takayama, Evslin, Ganaden, Holt, Ichiyama, Kong, Miyake; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Ilagan, Souza. |
2024-03-28 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by JHA on Tuesday, 04-02-24 2:00PM in conference room 325 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2024-03-28 | House | Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on JHA with none voting aye with reservations; Representative(s) Garcia, Ward voting no (2) and Representative(s) Gates, Ichiyama, Kila, Lowen, Tam excused (5). |
2024-03-28 | House | Reported from HET (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1515-24), recommending referral to JHA. |
2024-03-20 | House | The committee on HET recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Perruso, Kapela, La Chica, Marten, Matayoshi, M. Mizuno, Todd, Woodson; Ayes with reservations: none; 1 Noes: Representative(s) Garcia; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Martinez, Quinlan. |
2024-03-18 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by HET on Wednesday, 03-20-24 2:00PM in conference room 309 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2024-03-14 | House | Referred to HET, JHA, referral sheet 22 |
2024-03-08 | House | Offered |
Same As/Similar To
HCR205 (Same As) 2024-04-22 - Resolution adopted in final form.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HR&billnumber=185&year=2024 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/sessions/session2024/bills/HR185_.HTM |