HI HR19 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HR19
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-10 - Referred to WLH, FIN, referral sheet 39
Pending: House Water, Land, & Hawaiian Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 5 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-10 - Referred to WLH, FIN, referral sheet 39
Pending: House Water, Land, & Hawaiian Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The Auditor To Conduct A Performance Audit Of The Department Of Land And Natural Resources' Division Of Boating And Ocean Recreation.
Title
Requesting The Auditor To Conduct A Performance Audit Of The Department Of Land And Natural Resources' Division Of Boating And Ocean Recreation.
Sponsors
Rep. Nicole Lowen [D] | Rep. Richard Creagan [D] | Sen. Angus McKelvey [D] | Rep. Daynette Morikawa [D] |
Rep. Nadine Nakamura [D] | Rep. Chris Todd [D] | Rep. Ryan Yamane [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-10 | House | Referred to WLH, FIN, referral sheet 39 |
2020-02-06 | House | Offered |
2020-02-05 | House | To be offered. |
Same As/Similar To
HCR38 (Same As) 2020-03-10 - Referred to WLH, FIN, referral sheet 39
HR19 (Carry Over) 2019-03-21 - The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
HR19 (Carry Over) 2019-03-21 - The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HR&billnumber=19&year=2020 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2020/bills/HR19_.HTM |