HI HR210 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 10 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-03-30 - Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ilagan, Sayama, Woodson excused (3).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 10 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-03-30 - Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ilagan, Sayama, Woodson excused (3).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The Department Of Education To Report On The Feasibility Of Stocking Short-acting Bronchodilators In Schools For Emergency Use.
Title
Requesting The Department Of Education To Report On The Feasibility Of Stocking Short-acting Bronchodilators In Schools For Emergency Use.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-30 | House | Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ilagan, Sayama, Woodson excused (3). |
2023-03-30 | House | Reported from EDN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1693) as amended in HD 1, recommending referral to FIN. |
2023-03-23 | House | The committee on EDN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Woodson, Marten, Evslin, Kapela, La Chica, Matayoshi, Perruso, Quinlan; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Martinez, Todd, Garcia. |
2023-03-21 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by EDN on Thursday, 03-23-23 2:00PM in conference room 309 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2023-03-15 | House | Referred to EDN, FIN, referral sheet 20 |
2023-03-10 | House | Offered |
Same As/Similar To
HCR206 (Same As) 2023-03-30 - Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ilagan, Sayama, Woodson excused (3).