HI HR26 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 12 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-12 - Resolution adopted in final form.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 12 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-12 - Resolution adopted in final form.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The Department Of Taxation, With The Cooperation Of The Department Of Business, Economic Development, And Tourism, To Conduct A Study On The Feasibility Of Offering A Solar Water Heating System Tax Credit.
Title
DOTAX; DBEDT; Solar Water Heating System Tax Credit; Study
Sponsors
Rep. Mark Takai [D] | Sen. Chris Lee [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-12 | House | Resolution adopted in final form. |
2013-04-12 | House | Adopted with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Har, McDermott, Oshiro, Tokioka excused (4). |
2013-04-12 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1676), recommending adoption. |
2013-04-10 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 16 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Johanson, Cullen, Hashem, Ing, Jordan, Kobayashi, Lowen, Onishi, Takayama, Tokioka, Woodson, Yamashita, Fukumoto, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Morikawa. |
2013-04-08 | House | Scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 04-10-13 3:15PM in conference room 308. |
2013-03-28 | House | Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Belatti, Ito, C. Lee, Tokioka excused (4). |
2013-03-28 | House | Reported from EDB (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1245), recommending referral to FIN. |
2013-03-15 | House | The committees on EDB recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Tsuji, Ward, Brower, Cachola, Choy, Ohno, Onishi, Takayama, Tokioka; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2013-03-12 | House | Scheduled for decision making on Friday, 03-15-13 10:00AM in conference room 312. |
2013-02-26 | House | The committee(s) on EDB recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2013-02-22 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by EDB on Tuesday, 02-26-13 10:00AM in conference room 312. |
2013-02-20 | House | Referred to EDB, FIN, referral sheet 27 |
2013-02-14 | House | Offered |
2013-02-13 | House | To be offered. |
Same As/Similar To
HCR44 (Same As) 2013-04-15 - Referred to ENE/WAM.