HI HR36 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HR36
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-0)
Status: Passed on March 31 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-31 - Resolution adopted in final form.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-0)
Status: Passed on March 31 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-31 - Resolution adopted in final form.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Urging The United States Congress To Grant Additional Authority To The Federal Communications Commission To Stop Unwanted And Illegal Robocalls.
Title
Urging The United States Congress To Grant Additional Authority To The Federal Communications Commission To Stop Unwanted And Illegal Robocalls.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-19 - House - House Consumer Protection & Commerce: Passed, Unamended (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-31 | House | Resolution adopted in final form. |
2021-03-30 | House | Adopted with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Todd excused (1). |
2021-03-30 | House | Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1526), recommending adoption. |
2021-03-19 | House | The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Johanson, Kitagawa, Har, Hashem, Kong, Mizuno, Morikawa, Onishi, Tarnas, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Aquino. |
2021-03-17 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by CPC on Friday, 03-19-21 2:00PM in conference room 329 Via Videoconference. |
2021-02-24 | House | Referred to CPC, referral sheet 18 |
2021-02-23 | House | Offered |
2021-02-22 | House | To be offered. |
Same As/Similar To
HR36 (Carry Over) 2021-03-31 - Resolution adopted in final form.
HCR45 (Same As) 2021-04-20 - Resolution adopted in final form.
HCR45 (Same As) 2021-04-20 - Resolution adopted in final form.