HI HR39 | 2018 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HR39
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-0)
Status: Passed on April 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-04 - Resolution adopted in final form.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-0)
Status: Passed on April 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-04 - Resolution adopted in final form.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The Department Of Health To Adopt Administrative Rules Regarding Noise Level Standards For Residential And Commercial Areas Of The State.
Title
Requesting The Department Of Health To Adopt Administrative Rules Regarding Noise Level Standards For Residential And Commercial Areas Of The State.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-04 | House | Resolution adopted in final form. |
2018-04-04 | House | Adopted with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Choy, Fukumoto, Holt, C. Lee, McKelvey excused (5). |
2018-04-04 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1791-18), recommending adoption. |
2018-04-03 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 12 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Cachola, DeCoite, Gates, Holt, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, Lowen, Nakamura, Todd, Yamashita; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Fukumoto, Tupola, Ward. |
2018-03-29 | House | Scheduled for decision making on Tuesday, 04-03-18 10:05AM in conference room 308. |
2018-03-28 | House | Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Souki excused (1). |
2018-03-28 | House | Reported from HHS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1569-18), recommending referral to FIN. |
2018-03-21 | House | The committees on HHS recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 4 Ayes: Representative(s) Mizuno, Kobayashi, Belatti, Learmont; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Tupola. |
2018-03-16 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by HHS on Wednesday, 03-21-18 8:30AM in conference room 329. |
2018-03-13 | House | Referred to HHS, FIN, referral sheet 39 |
2018-03-02 | House | Offered |
2018-03-01 | House | To be offered. |
Same As/Similar To
HCR51 (Same As) 2018-04-10 - Referred to CPH.
HR39 (Carry Over) 2017-03-07 - Referred to IAC, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 26
HR39 (Carry Over) 2017-03-07 - Referred to IAC, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 26
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HR&billnumber=39&year=2018 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2018/bills/HR39_.HTM |