HI HR42 | 2018 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HR42
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 2 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-20 - The committee(s) on EEP recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Energy & Environmental Protection Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 2 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-20 - The committee(s) on EEP recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Energy & Environmental Protection Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The Department Of Business, Economic Development, And Tourism To Conduct A Study On The Ability Of Using Wave Energy Production To Meet The State's Renewable Energy Goals.
Title
Requesting The Department Of Business, Economic Development, And Tourism To Conduct A Study On The Ability Of Using Wave Energy Production To Meet The State's Renewable Energy Goals.
Sponsors
Rep. Kaniela Ing [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-20 | House | The committee(s) on EEP recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2018-03-15 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by EEP on Tuesday, 03-20-18 9:00AM in conference room 325. |
2018-03-13 | House | Referred to EEP, FIN, referral sheet 39 |
2018-03-06 | House | Offered |
2018-03-02 | House | To be offered. |
Same As/Similar To
HCR55 (Same As) 2018-03-20 - The committee(s) on EEP recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
HR42 (Carry Over) 2017-04-17 - Resolution adopted in final form.
HR42 (Carry Over) 2017-04-17 - Resolution adopted in final form.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HR&billnumber=42&year=2018 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2018/bills/HR42_.HTM |