HI HR43 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HR43
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-1)
Status: Introduced on February 27 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-10 - Referred to EDB, FIN, referral sheet 39
Pending: House Economic Development & Business Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 27 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-10 - Referred to EDB, FIN, referral sheet 39
Pending: House Economic Development & Business Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Supporting Sustainable Business Corporations, Celebrating And Commending The Practice Of Business As A Force For Good, And Seeking To Increase The Percentage Of Sustainable Business Corporations In The State.
Title
Supporting Sustainable Business Corporations, Celebrating And Commending The Practice Of Business As A Force For Good, And Seeking To Increase The Percentage Of Sustainable Business Corporations In The State.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-10 | House | Referred to EDB, FIN, referral sheet 39 |
2020-02-28 | House | Offered |
2020-02-27 | House | To be offered. |
Same As/Similar To
HCR58 (Same As) 2020-03-10 - Referred to EDB, FIN, referral sheet 39
HR43 (Carry Over) 2019-03-27 - Resolution adopted in final form.
HR43 (Carry Over) 2019-03-27 - Resolution adopted in final form.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HR&billnumber=43&year=2020 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2020/bills/HR43_.HTM |