HI HR44 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 14 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-14 - (H) Resolution adopted in final form.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 14 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-14 - (H) Resolution adopted in final form.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Urging The United States Congress To Propose An Amendment To The United States Constitution For The States' Consideration To Provide That Corporations Are Not Persons Under The Laws Of The United States Or Any Of Its Jurisdictional Subdivisions.
Title
Clarifying that Corporations are Not People
Sponsors
Rep. Roy Takumi [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-14 | (H) Resolution adopted in final form. | |
2011-04-14 | (H) Adopted as amended in HD 1 with none voting no and Carroll, Chong, M. Oshiro, Say, Thielen excused. | |
2011-04-14 | (H) Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1608) as amended in HD 1, recommending adoption. | |
2011-04-07 | (H) The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 12 Ayes: Representative(s) Keith-Agaran, Rhoads, Brower, Cabanilla, Coffman, Herkes, Luke, Souki, Tsuji, Fontaine, Marumoto, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 4 Excused: Representative(s) Carroll, Ito, McKelvey, B. Oshiro. | |
2011-04-05 | (H) Resolution scheduled to be heard by JUD on Thursday, 04-07-11 2:00PM in conference room 325. | |
2011-02-18 | (H) Referred to JUD, referral sheet 24 | |
2011-02-17 | (H) Offered | |
2011-02-16 | (H) To be offered. |
Same As/Similar To
HCR51 (Same As) 2011-04-18 - (S) Referred to JDL.