HI HR45 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 28 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-28 - Resolution adopted in final form.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 28 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-03-28 - Resolution adopted in final form.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Urging The Department Of Transportation And City And County Of Honolulu To Install Speed Bumps And Speed Limit Signage On The Portion Of Kapolei Parkway Between Kapolei High School And Kapolei Middle School.
Title
Urging The Department Of Transportation And City And County Of Honolulu To Install Speed Bumps And Speed Limit Signage On The Portion Of Kapolei Parkway Between Kapolei High School And Kapolei Middle School.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-28 | House | Resolution adopted in final form. |
2024-03-28 | House | Adopted as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Gates, Ichiyama, Kila, Lowen, Tam excused (5). |
2024-03-28 | House | Reported from TRN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1539-24) as amended in HD 1, recommending adoption. |
2024-03-21 | House | The committee on TRN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Todd, Kila, Aiu, Evslin, Kitagawa, Miyake, Onishi; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Matsumoto. |
2024-03-15 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by TRN on Thursday, 03-21-24 10:30AM in conference room 312 VIA VIDEOCONFERENCE. |
2024-03-08 | House | Referred to TRN, referral sheet 18 |
2024-03-07 | House | Offered |
2024-03-05 | House | To be offered. |
Same As/Similar To
HCR62 (Same As) 2024-04-26 - Received notice of disagreement (Hse. Com. No. 824).
Subjects
Department of Transportation
Kapolei High School
Kapolei Middle School
Kapolei Parkway
Speed Bumps
Speed Limit Signage
Kapolei High School
Kapolei Middle School
Kapolei Parkway
Speed Bumps
Speed Limit Signage