HI HR52 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 29 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-29 - Transmitted to Senate.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 29 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-29 - Transmitted to Senate.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Urging The United States To Support The Republic Of China's (taiwan) Participation In The Trans-pacific Partnership.
Title
Taiwan' Trans-Pacific Partnership
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-29 | House | Transmitted to Senate. |
2014-04-29 | House | Adopted as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Ito, Takai excused (2). |
2014-04-25 | House | Deferred one day 04-29-14. |
2014-04-25 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1718-14) as amended in HD 1, recommending adoption. |
2014-04-17 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 16 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Nishimoto, Johanson, Cullen, Ing, Jordan, Kobayashi, Lowen, Morikawa, Onishi, Takayama, Tokioka, Woodson, Yamashita, Fukumoto, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Hashem. |
2014-04-17 | House | Resolution re-scheduled to be heard by FIN on Thursday, 04-17-14 1:30PM in conference room 308. |
2014-04-15 | House | Proposed draft of Resolution scheduled to be heard by FIN on Thursday, 04-17-14 1:30PM in conference room 309. |
2014-03-25 | House | Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Har, Yamane excused (2). |
2014-03-25 | House | Reported from EDN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1299-14), recommending referral to FIN. |
2014-03-17 | House | The committees on EDN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Takumi, Ohno, Awana, Choy, Ichiyama, Say; Ayes with reservations: Representative(s) Fale; Noes: none; and 4 Excused: Representative(s) Aquino, Hanohano, Takai, Matsumoto. |
2014-03-14 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by EDN on Monday, 03-17-14 2:00PM in conference room 309. |
2014-03-10 | House | Referred to EDN, FIN, referral sheet 30 |
2014-03-06 | House | Offered |
2014-03-05 | House | To be offered. |
Same As/Similar To
HCR78 (Same As) 2014-04-29 - Resolution adopted in final form.