HI HR53 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 12 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-12 - Resolution adopted in final form.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 12 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-12 - Resolution adopted in final form.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Expressing Commitment To The Constitution Of The United States.
Title
National Defense Authorization Act
Sponsors
Rep. Roy Takumi [D] | Sen. Karl Rhoads [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-12 | House | Resolution adopted in final form. |
2013-04-12 | House | Adopted with Fale, Ward voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Har, McDermott, Oshiro, Tokioka excused (4). |
2013-04-12 | House | Reported from VMI (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1686), recommending adoption. |
2013-04-03 | House | The committees on VMI recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Takai, Ito, Brower, Ohno, Onishi, Takayama, Tsuji; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Cachola, Choy, McDermott. |
2013-04-01 | House | Re-referred to VMI, referral sheet 47 |
2013-04-01 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by VMI on Wednesday, 04-03-13 11:05AM in conference room 312. |
2013-03-14 | House | Referred to VMI, JUD, referral sheet 37 |
2013-03-08 | House | Offered |
2013-03-07 | House | To be offered. |
Same As/Similar To
HCR69 (Same As) 2013-04-15 - Referred to JDL.
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HR&billnumber=53&year=2013 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2013/Bills/HR53_.HTM |