HI HR57 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-3)
Status: Introduced on March 6 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-21 - The committee(s) on HLT recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 6 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-03-21 - The committee(s) on HLT recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The Convening Of A Task Force To Examine The Benefits And Risks Of Widespread Availability And Distribution Of Epinephrine Auto-injectors In The State For Emergency Treatment.
Title
Epinephrine Auto-Injector; Widespread Availability and Use; Task Force
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-21 | House | The committee(s) on HLT recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2014-03-18 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by HLT on Friday, 03-21-14 8:30AM in conference room 329. |
2014-03-10 | House | Referred to HLT, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 30 |
2014-03-06 | House | Offered |
2014-03-06 | House | To be offered. |
Same As/Similar To
HCR83 (Same As) 2014-03-21 - The committee(s) on HLT recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HR&billnumber=57&year=2014 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2014/bills/HR57_.HTM |