HI HR58 | 2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HR58
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 23-2)
Status: Passed on April 5 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-05 - Resolution adopted in final form.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 23-2)
Status: Passed on April 5 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-05 - Resolution adopted in final form.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The Department Of Budget And Finance To Provide A Status Report On The Hawaii Able Savings Program.
Title
Requesting The Department Of Budget And Finance To Provide A Status Report On The Hawaii Able Savings Program.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-05 | House | Resolution adopted in final form. |
2017-04-05 | House | Adopted with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). |
2017-04-05 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1608), recommending adoption. |
2017-04-04 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 14 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Cachola, Choy, DeCoite, Holt, Keohokalole, Kobayashi, LoPresti, Lowen, Nakamura, Tokioka, Yamashita, Tupola; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Gates, Quinlan, Ward. |
2017-03-31 | House | Scheduled for decision making on Tuesday, 04-04-17 10:35AM in conference room 308. |
2017-03-29 | House | Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Aquino, Oshiro, Say, Thielen excused (4). |
2017-03-29 | House | Reported from HUS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1403), recommending referral to FIN. |
2017-03-22 | House | The committees on HUS recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Representative(s) Morikawa, Todd, Belatti, Kobayashi, Tupola; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Har, Oshiro. |
2017-03-20 | House | Broadcast of hearing/briefing available. See: www.capitoltv.org |
2017-03-20 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by HUS on Wednesday, 03-22-17 10:30AM in conference room 329. |
2017-03-13 | House | Referred to HUS, FIN, referral sheet 29 |
2017-03-09 | House | Offered |
2017-03-08 | House | To be offered. |
Same As/Similar To
HR58 (Carry Over) 2017-04-05 - Resolution adopted in final form.
HCR96 (Same As) 2017-04-24 - Resolution adopted in final form.
HCR96 (Same As) 2017-04-24 - Resolution adopted in final form.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HR&billnumber=58&year=2017 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2017/bills/HR58_.HTM |