HI HR58 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HR58
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Introduced on March 3 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-10 - Referred to JUD, FIN, referral sheet 39
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 3 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-10 - Referred to JUD, FIN, referral sheet 39
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The Office Of The Clerk Of Each County To Designate And Establish Additional Voter Service Centers At Appropriate Locations For The 2020 Elections.
Title
Requesting The Office Of The Clerk Of Each County To Designate And Establish Additional Voter Service Centers At Appropriate Locations For The 2020 Elections.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-10 | House | Referred to JUD, FIN, referral sheet 39 |
2020-03-05 | House | Offered |
2020-03-03 | House | To be offered. |
Same As/Similar To
HR58 (Carry Over) 2019-03-27 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Creagan, DeCoite, Holt, McKelvey excused (4).
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HR&billnumber=58&year=2020 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2020/bills/HR58_.HTM |