HI HR60 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 12 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-12 - Resolution adopted in final form.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 12 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-12 - Resolution adopted in final form.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The Executive Office On Aging To Continue Its Research Of The Timebanking Concept For Hawaii's Respite System.
Title
Executive Office on Aging; Timebanking
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-12 | House | Resolution adopted in final form. |
2013-04-12 | House | Adopted with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Har, McDermott, Oshiro, Tokioka excused (4). |
2013-04-12 | House | Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1702), recommending adoption. |
2013-04-10 | House | The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) McKelvey, Kawakami, Brower, Cachola, Evans, C. Lee, Tsuji, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 7 Excused: Representative(s) Belatti, Cabanilla, Carroll, Har, Ito, Yamane, McDermott. |
2013-04-05 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by CPC on Wednesday, 04-10-13 2:10PM in conference room 325. |
2013-04-02 | House | Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Carroll excused (1). |
2013-04-02 | House | Reported from HLT (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1349), recommending referral to CPC. |
2013-03-27 | House | The committees on HLT recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Belatti, Morikawa, Jordan, Kobayashi, Woodson, Cheape; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Cabanilla, Carroll. |
2013-03-22 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by HLT on Wednesday, 03-27-13 10:00AM in conference room 329. |
2013-03-14 | House | Referred to HLT, CPC, referral sheet 37 |
2013-03-11 | House | Offered |
2013-03-08 | House | To be offered. |
Same As/Similar To
HCR76 (Same As) 2013-04-24 - Resolution adopted in final form.
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HR&billnumber=60&year=2013 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2013/Bills/HR60_.HTM |