HI HR62 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HR62
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on March 3 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-16 - This measure has been deleted from the meeting scheduled on Tuesday 03-17-20 9:00AM in conference room 312.
Pending: House Tourism & International Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 3 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-16 - This measure has been deleted from the meeting scheduled on Tuesday 03-17-20 9:00AM in conference room 312.
Pending: House Tourism & International Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Urging The Hawaii Tourism Authority To Issue Requests For Proposals For Redevelopment Of The Hawaii Convention Center.
Title
Urging The Hawaii Tourism Authority To Issue Requests For Proposals For Redevelopment Of The Hawaii Convention Center.
Sponsors
Rep. Richard Onishi [D] | Rep. Della au Belatti [D] | Rep. Daniel Holt [D] | Rep. Sylvia Luke [D] |
Rep. Daynette Morikawa [D] | Rep. Mark Nakashima [D] | Rep. Scott Saiki [D] | Rep. Kyle Yamashita [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-16 | House | This measure has been deleted from the meeting scheduled on Tuesday 03-17-20 9:00AM in conference room 312. |
2020-03-13 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by TIA on Tuesday, 03-17-20 9:00AM in conference room 312. |
2020-03-10 | House | Referred to TIA, FIN, referral sheet 39 |
2020-03-05 | House | Offered |
2020-03-03 | House | To be offered. |
Same As/Similar To
HCR79 (Same As) 2020-03-16 - This measure has been deleted from the meeting scheduled on Tuesday 03-17-20 9:00AM in conference room 312.
HR62 (Carry Over) 2019-03-28 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cabanilla Arakawa, C. Lee excused (2).
HR62 (Carry Over) 2019-03-28 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cabanilla Arakawa, C. Lee excused (2).
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HR&billnumber=62&year=2020 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2020/bills/HR62_.HTM |