HI HR68 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 9 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-30 - (H) Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on JUD with Fontaine voting aye with reservations; Ching, McKelvey, Ward voting no (3) and Carroll, Herkes, Manahan, Wooley excused (4).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 9 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-30 - (H) Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on JUD with Fontaine voting aye with reservations; Ching, McKelvey, Ward voting no (3) and Carroll, Herkes, Manahan, Wooley excused (4).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Recognizing Hawaiian Nationals As A Population Residing Lawfully In The Hawaiian Islands.
Title
Hawaiian National
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-30 | (H) Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on JUD with Fontaine voting aye with reservations; Ching, McKelvey, Ward voting no (3) and Carroll, Herkes, Manahan, Wooley excused (4). | |
2012-03-30 | (H) Reported from HAW (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1364-12), recommending referral to JUD. | |
2012-03-21 | (H) The committees on HAW recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Hanohano, C. Lee, Belatti, Mizuno, Morikawa, Wooley, Yamane; Ayes with reservations: Pine, Ward; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Jordan. | |
2012-03-19 | (H) Resolution scheduled to be heard by HAW on Wednesday, 03-21-12 9:00AM in conference room 329. | |
2012-03-13 | (H) Referred to HAW, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 44 | |
2012-03-12 | (H) Offered | |
2012-03-09 | (H) To be offered. |
Same As/Similar To
HCR96 (Same As) 2012-03-30 - (H) Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on JUD with Fontaine voting aye with reservations; Ching, McKelvey, Ward voting no (3) and Carroll, Herkes, Manahan, Wooley excused (4).