HI HR68 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 11 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-10 - The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 11 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-04-10 - The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The Department Of Commerce And Consumer Affairs And The Department Of Taxation To Conduct A Study Examining The Parity Of The Current Tax Fee Structure Imposed On Video Programming Service Providers.
Title
Video Programming Service Providers; Study
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-10 | House | The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2013-04-05 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by CPC on Wednesday, 04-10-13 2:10PM in conference room 325. |
2013-03-28 | House | Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Belatti, Ito, C. Lee, Tokioka excused (4). |
2013-03-28 | House | Reported from EDB (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1248), recommending referral to CPC. |
2013-03-22 | House | The committees on EDB recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Tsuji, Ward, Brower, Cachola, Choy, Ohno, Onishi, Takayama, Tokioka; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2013-03-20 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by EDB on Friday, 03-22-13 10:30AM in conference room 312. |
2013-03-14 | House | Referred to EDB, CPC, referral sheet 37 |
2013-03-12 | House | Offered |
2013-03-11 | House | To be offered. |
Same As/Similar To
HCR88 (Same As) 2013-04-10 - The committee(s) on CPC recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.