HI HR68 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HR68
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Passed on April 7 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-07 - Resolution adopted in final form.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Passed on April 7 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-07 - Resolution adopted in final form.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Urging The City And County Of Honolulu Department Of Environmental Services And Partners To Utilize The Property Located At 45-230 Kulauli Street, Kaneohe, Hawaii, For Aquaculture Purposes That Will Not Unreasonably Interfere With The Department's Regular Use Of The Property.
Title
Urging The City And County Of Honolulu Department Of Environmental Services And Partners To Utilize The Property Located At 45-230 Kulauli Street, Kaneohe, Hawaii, For Aquaculture Purposes That Will Not Unreasonably Interfere With The Department's Regular Use Of The Property.
Sponsors
Rep. Scot Matayoshi [D] | Rep. Patrick Branco [D] | Rep. Stacelynn Eli [D] | Sen. Troy Hashimoto [D] |
Rep. Lisa Kitagawa [D] | Rep. Lisa Marten [D] | Rep. Takashi Ohno [D] | Rep. Adrian Tam [D] |
Rep. David Tarnas [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-04-05 - House - House Judiciary & Hawaiian Affairs: Passed, Unamended (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-23 - House - House Agriculture: Passed, Unamended (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-23 - House - House Agriculture: Passed, Unamended (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-07 | House | Resolution adopted in final form. |
2022-04-07 | House | Adopted with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Costales, D. Kobayashi, Nishimoto excused (3). |
2022-04-07 | House | Reported from JHA (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1706-22), recommending adoption. |
2022-04-05 | House | The committees on JHA recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 10 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakashima, Matayoshi, Ichiyama, LoPresti, Lowen, McKelvey, Nakamura, Takumi, Tokioka, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) D. Kobayashi. |
2022-04-01 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by JHA on Tuesday, 04-05-22 2:00PM in conference room 325 Via Videoconference. |
2022-03-31 | House | Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on JHA with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Eli, Hashem, D. Kobayashi, Ohno excused (4). |
2022-03-31 | House | Reported from AGR (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1633-22), recommending referral to JHA. |
2022-03-23 | House | The committees on AGR recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Hashem, Perruso, Lowen, Marten, Matayoshi, Todd, Tokioka, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2022-03-21 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by AGR on Wednesday, 03-23-22 9:00AM in conference room 325 Via Videoconference. |
2022-03-14 | House | Referred to AGR, JHA, referral sheet 27 |
2022-03-11 | House | Offered |
2022-03-10 | House | To be offered. |
Same As/Similar To
HCR75 (Same As) 2022-05-05 - Resolution adopted in final form.
HR68 (Carry Over) 2021-03-31 - Resolution adopted in final form.
HR68 (Carry Over) 2021-03-31 - Resolution adopted in final form.