HI HR7 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on April 9 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-09 - (H) Resolution adopted in final form.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on April 9 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-09 - (H) Resolution adopted in final form.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Extending The Deadline For The Home For Life Task Force To Report On Its Findings And Recommendations For Reducing Barriers To Aging In Place And Facilitating Multigenerational Living.
Title
Home for Life Task Force; Extension of Report to Legislature
Sponsors
Sen. Henry Aquino [D] | Rep. Marilyn Lee [D] | Rep. John Mizuno [D] | Sen. Maile Shimabukuro [D] |
Rep. Cynthia Thielen [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-09 | (H) Resolution adopted in final form. | |
2010-04-09 | (H) Adopted with none voting no and Bertram, Hanohano, McKelvey, Sagum excused. | |
2010-04-09 | (H) Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1287-10), recommending adoption. | |
2010-04-07 | (H) The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: Representative(s) M. Oshiro, M. Lee, Awana, Brower, Choy, Coffman, Keith-Agaran, C. Lee, Nishimoto, Sagum, Tokioka, Wooley, Yamashita, Finnegan, Ward; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Aquino, Har. | |
2010-04-05 | (H) Scheduled for decision making on Wednesday, 04-07-10 2:15PM in conference room 308. | |
2010-03-24 | (H) Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting no and Belatti, Berg, Chang, Mizuno, M. Oshiro, Shimabukuro, Thielen excused. | |
2010-03-24 | (H) Reported from HLT/HUS (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 965-10), recommending referral to FIN. | |
2010-03-18 | (H) The committees on HUS recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Mizuno, Brower, Bertram, Nishimoto, Yamane; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 4 Excused: Belatti, Carroll, Shimabukuro, Ward. | |
2010-03-18 | (H) The committees on HLT recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 5 Ayes: Yamane, Nishimoto, Bertram, Brower, Mizuno; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 4 Excused: Belatti, Carroll, Shimabukuro, Finnegan. | |
2010-03-15 | (H) Resolution scheduled to be heard by HLT/HUS on Thursday, 03-18-10 10:30AM in conference room 329. | |
2010-01-29 | (H) Referred to HLT/HUS, FIN, referral sheet 11 | |
2010-01-28 | (H) Offered | |
2010-01-20 | (H) To be offered. |
Same As/Similar To
HCR13 (Same As) 2010-04-29 - (H) Resolution adopted in final form.