HI HR7 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-3)
Status: Passed on April 2 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-02 - Resolution adopted in final form.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-3)
Status: Passed on April 2 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-02 - Resolution adopted in final form.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The University Of Hawaii To Affirm Its Commitment To Upholding The Tenets Of Title Ix And The Violence Against Women Act 2013 And The University Of Hawaii's Dedication To Ending All Forms Of Sexual Violence On Hawaii Campuses Through A Report On The Status Of Title Ix And Violence Against Women Act 2013 Policies, Procedures, Staffing, And Statistics.
Title
None
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-02 | House | Resolution adopted in final form. |
2014-04-02 | House | Adopted as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Cachola, Hashem, Wooley excused (3). |
2014-04-02 | House | Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1383-14) as amended in HD 1, recommending adoption. |
2014-04-01 | House | The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 9 Ayes: Representative(s) Rhoads, Creagan, Kawakami, C. Lee, Nakashima, Tsuji, Wooley, McDermott, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 4 Excused: Representative(s) Har, Belatti, Brower, Ito. |
2014-03-28 | House | Scheduled for decision making on Tuesday, 04-01-14 2:00PM in conference room 325. |
2014-03-28 | House | The committee(s) on JUD recommend(s) that the measure be deferred until 04-01-14 at 2:00pm. |
2014-03-27 | House | Broadcast of hearing/briefing available. See: www.capitoltv.org |
2014-03-25 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by JUD on Friday, 03-28-14 2:00PM in conference room 325. |
2014-03-25 | House | Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Har, Yamane excused (2). |
2014-03-25 | House | Reported from HED (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1266-14), recommending referral to JUD. |
2014-03-13 | House | The committees on HED recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Choy, Ichiyama, Awana, Hanohano, Ohno, Takumi, Matsumoto, Fale; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Aquino, Say, Takai. |
2014-03-11 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by HED on Thursday, 03-13-14 2:00PM in conference room 309. |
2014-01-29 | House | Referred to HED, JUD, referral sheet 9 |
2014-01-21 | House | Offered |
2014-01-17 | House | To be offered. |
Same As/Similar To
HCR12 (Same As) 2014-04-24 - Resolution adopted in final form.