HI HR71 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on February 25 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-18 - (H) The committee(s) recommends that the measure be deferred.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 25 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-18 - (H) The committee(s) recommends that the measure be deferred.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The Civil Defense Division Of The Department Of Defense To Prepare A Report On The Feasibility Of Requiring All Retail Gasoline Stations In The State To Be Pre-wired For Electrical Generators.
Title
Disaster Preparedness; Electrical Generators
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-18 | (H) The committee(s) recommends that the measure be deferred. | |
2010-03-15 | (H) Resolution scheduled to be heard by PBS on Thursday, 03-18-10 9:00AM in conference room 309. | |
2010-03-03 | (H) Referred to PBS, CPC, referral sheet 32 | |
2010-02-26 | (H) Offered | |
2010-02-25 | (H) To be offered. |
Same As/Similar To
HCR130 (Same As) 2010-03-18 - (H) The committee(s) recommends that the measure be deferred.
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://capitol.hawaii.gov/Archives/measure_indiv_Archives.aspx?billtype=HR&billnumber=71&year=2010 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2010/Bills/HR71_.HTM |