HI HR74 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HR74
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Introduced on March 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-22 - The committee(s) on AGR/HSG recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Agriculture Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-22 - The committee(s) on AGR/HSG recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Pending: House Agriculture Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The Director Of The Office Of Planning To Establish Within The Office Of Planning An Agricultural Housing Task Force.
Title
Requesting The Director Of The Office Of Planning To Establish Within The Office Of Planning An Agricultural Housing Task Force.
Sponsors
Rep. Richard Creagan [D] | Rep. Rida Cabanilla Arakawa [D] | Rep. Romy Cachola [D] | Rep. Lynn Decoite [D] |
Rep. Nicole Lowen [D] | Rep. Amy Perruso [D] | Rep. David Tarnas [D] | Sen. Joy San Buenaventura [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-22 | House | The committee(s) on AGR/HSG recommend(s) that the measure be deferred. |
2019-03-19 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by AGR/HSG on Friday, 03-22-19 10:00AM in House conference room 312. |
2019-03-14 | House | Referred to AGR/HSG, FIN, referral sheet 33 |
2019-03-08 | House | Offered |
2019-03-07 | House | To be offered. |
Same As/Similar To
HR74 (Carry Over) 2019-03-22 - The committee(s) on AGR/HSG recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
HCR76 (Same As) 2019-03-22 - The committee(s) on AGR/HSG recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
HCR76 (Same As) 2019-03-22 - The committee(s) on AGR/HSG recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HR&billnumber=74&year=2019 |
Text | https://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2019/bills/HR74_.HTM |