HI HR88 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-4)
Status: Introduced on March 11 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-29 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Har, Ing, Kong, Luke, Saiki, Thielen, Tokioka excused (7).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 11 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-29 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Har, Ing, Kong, Luke, Saiki, Thielen, Tokioka excused (7).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting State Departments And The Several Counties To Affirm The Tenets And Principles Found In The Convention On The Elimination Of All Forms Of Discrimination Against Women.
Title
Discrimination; Women; State; Counties
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-29 | House | Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Har, Ing, Kong, Luke, Saiki, Thielen, Tokioka excused (7). |
2016-03-29 | House | Reported from LAB (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1362-16), recommending referral to FIN. |
2016-03-22 | House | The committees on LAB recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Nakashima, Keohokalole, Ichiyama, Johanson, LoPresti, San Buenaventura, Yamashita; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 4 Excused: Representative(s) Aquino, Har, Takumi, Tupola. |
2016-03-18 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by LAB on Tuesday, 03-22-16 10:30AM in conference room 309. |
2016-03-14 | House | Referred to LAB, FIN, referral sheet 28 |
2016-03-11 | House | Offered |
Same As/Similar To
HCR136 (Same As) 2016-03-29 - Report adopted; referred to the committee(s) on FIN with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Har, Ing, Kong, Luke, Saiki, Thielen, Tokioka excused (7).
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=HR&billnumber=88&year=2016 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2016/bills/HR88_.HTM |