HI HR93 | 2018 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HR93
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 9 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-28 - Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Souki excused (1).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 9 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-28 - Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Souki excused (1).
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The Judiciary To Convene A Working Group To Develop And Implement Protocols For Handling Criminal Cases Involving Vulnerable Victims And Witnesses.
Title
Requesting The Judiciary To Convene A Working Group To Develop And Implement Protocols For Handling Criminal Cases Involving Vulnerable Victims And Witnesses.
Sponsors
Rep. Cindy Evans [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-28 | House | Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Souki excused (1). |
2018-03-28 | House | Reported from JUD (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1669-18) as amended in HD 1, recommending referral to FIN. |
2018-03-27 | House | The committees on JUD recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 6 Ayes: Representative(s) Nishimoto, San Buenaventura, C. Lee, Morikawa, Takayama, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Brower, McDermott. |
2018-03-23 | House | Proposed draft of Resolution scheduled to be heard by JUD on Tuesday, 03-27-18 2:00PM in House conference room 325. |
2018-03-13 | House | Referred to JUD, FIN, referral sheet 39 |
2018-03-08 | House | Offered |
2018-03-09 | House | To be offered. |
Same As/Similar To
HCR107 (Same As) 2018-03-28 - Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Souki excused (1).
HR93 (Carry Over) 2017-03-24 - The committee(s) on OMH recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.
HR93 (Carry Over) 2017-03-24 - The committee(s) on OMH recommend(s) that the measure be deferred.