HI HR93 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HR93
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 22-1)
Status: Passed on April 7 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-07 - Resolution adopted in final form.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 22-1)
Status: Passed on April 7 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-07 - Resolution adopted in final form.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requesting The Early Learning Board To Prepare A Report Containing A Road Map, Including Proposed Legislation, For The Implementation Of Act 46, Session Laws Of Hawaii 2020.
Title
Requesting The Early Learning Board To Prepare A Report Containing A Road Map, Including Proposed Legislation, For The Implementation Of Act 46, Session Laws Of Hawaii 2020.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-05 - House - House Finance: Passed, Unamended (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-03-24 - House - House Education: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-03-24 - House - House Education: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-07 | House | Resolution adopted in final form. |
2022-04-07 | House | Adopted with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Costales, D. Kobayashi, Nishimoto excused (3). |
2022-04-07 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1746-22), recommending adoption. |
2022-04-05 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 12 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Yamashita, Branco, Eli, Ilagan, B. Kobayashi, Marten, Nishimoto, Sayama, Tam, Todd, Wildberger; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 3 Excused: Representative(s) Holt, Perruso, McDermott. |
2022-04-01 | House | Scheduled for decision making on Tuesday, 04-05-22 3:30PM in conference room 308 Via Videoconference. |
2022-03-31 | House | Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 1 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Eli, Hashem, D. Kobayashi, Ohno excused (4). |
2022-03-31 | House | Reported from EDN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1606-22) as amended in HD 1, recommending referral to FIN. |
2022-03-24 | House | The committees on EDN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) Woodson, Kapela, Belatti, Clark, Costales, Ganaden, Hashimoto, Quinlan, Takayama, Yamane, Okimoto; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 2 Excused: Representative(s) Gates, Ohno. |
2022-03-22 | House | Resolution scheduled to be heard by EDN on Thursday, 03-24-22 2:00PM in conference room 309 Via Videoconference. |
2022-03-14 | House | Referred to EDN, FIN, referral sheet 27 |
2022-03-11 | House | Offered |
Same As/Similar To
HR93 (Carry Over) 2021-03-15 - Referred to JHA, referral sheet 25