HI SB1003 | 2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB1003
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-22 - The committee on WAM deferred the measure.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-22 - The committee on WAM deferred the measure.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the Department of Taxation to require electronic filing of tax returns, subject to exceptions for reasonable cause as provided by administrative rules.
Title
Relating To Electronic Filing.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-22 | Senate | The committee on WAM deferred the measure. |
2017-02-21 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM deferred the measure until 02-22-17 9:25AM in conference room 211. |
2017-02-14 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM deferred the measure until 02-21-17 10:00AM in conference room 211. |
2017-02-07 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM deferred the measure until 02-14-17 9:30AM in conference room 211. |
2017-02-03 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM has scheduled a public hearing on 02-07-17 9:30AM in conference room 211. |
2017-01-25 | Senate | Referred to WAM. |
2017-01-25 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2017-01-25 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1003 (Carry Over) 2017-02-22 - The committee on WAM deferred the measure.
HB1137 (Same As) 2017-01-27 - Referred to FIN, referral sheet 5
HB1137 (Same As) 2017-01-27 - Referred to FIN, referral sheet 5
Subjects
Hawaii State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/measure_indiv.aspx?billtype=SB&billnumber=1003&year=2017 |
Text | http://www.capitol.hawaii.gov/session2017/bills/SB1003_.HTM |