HI SB1004 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SB1004
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-23 - Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday, 04-23-21 at 5:00 PM in CR 309.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-23 - Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday, 04-23-21 at 5:00 PM in CR 309.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Beginning with the 2022-2023 school year, requires the department of education to include the teaching of financial literacy in the personal/transition plan requirement for each student. Effective 7/1/2050. (HD2)
Title
Relating To Education.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-07 - House - House Finance: Passed, Unamended (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-23 - House - House Consumer Protection & Commerce: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-16 - House - House Education: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-23 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Passed, Unamended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-08 - Senate - Senate Education: Passed, Unamended (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-23 - House - House Consumer Protection & Commerce: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-16 - House - House Education: Passed, With Amendments (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-23 - Senate - Senate Judiciary: Passed, Unamended (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-08 - Senate - Senate Education: Passed, Unamended (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-23 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday, 04-23-21 at 5:00 PM in CR 309. |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Conference committee meeting to reconvene on 04-23-21 3:00PM; CR 309. |
2021-04-22 | House | Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Thursday, 04-22-21 at 5:00 PM in CR 309. |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Conference committee meeting scheduled for 04-22-21 3:00PM; CR 309. |
2021-04-21 | House | Received notice of Senate conferees (Sen. Com. No. 849). |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Senate Conferees Appointed: Kidani Chair; Keohokalole Co-Chair; Kanuha, Fevella. |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Received notice of appointment of House conferees (Hse. Com. No. 559). |
2021-04-16 | House | House Conferees Appointed: Woodson, Johanson, Ilagan Co-Chairs; Ganaden, Perruso, Okimoto. |
2021-04-13 | House | Received notice of disagreement (Sen. Com. No. 788). |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Senate disagrees with House amendments. |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Received from House (Hse. Com. No. 479). |
2021-04-09 | House | Passed Third Reading with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). Transmitted to Senate. |
2021-04-09 | House | Reported from FIN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1813), recommending passage on Third Reading. |
2021-04-07 | House | The committees on FIN recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 15 Ayes: Representative(s) Luke, Cullen, Branco, Eli, Holt, Ilagan, B. Kobayashi, Marten, Nishimoto, Perruso, Sayama, Tam, Wildberger, Yamashita, McDermott; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2021-04-05 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by FIN on Wednesday, 04-07-21 1:30PM in House conference room 308 Via Videoconference. |
2021-03-25 | House | Report adopted. referred to the committee(s) on FIN as amended in HD 2 with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and none excused (0). |
2021-03-25 | House | Reported from CPC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1417) as amended in HD 2, recommending referral to FIN. |
2021-03-23 | House | The committees on CPC recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) Johanson, Kitagawa, Aquino, Har, Hashem, Kong, Mizuno, Morikawa, Onishi, Tarnas, Matsumoto; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and Excused: none. |
2021-03-19 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by CPC on Tuesday, 03-23-21 2:00PM in House conference room 329 Via Videoconference. |
2021-03-19 | House | Passed Second Reading as amended in HD 1 and referred to the committee(s) on CPC with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Representative(s) Todd excused (1). |
2021-03-19 | House | Reported from EDN (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 1030) as amended in HD 1, recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to CPC. |
2021-03-16 | House | The committees on EDN recommend that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes were as follows: 11 Ayes: Representative(s) Woodson, Kapela, Belatti, DeCoite, Ganaden, Gates, Hashimoto, Quinlan, Takayama, Yamane, Okimoto; Ayes with reservations: none; 0 Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Ohno. |
2021-03-12 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by EDN on Tuesday, 03-16-21 2:00PM in House conference room 309 Via Videoconference. |
2021-03-09 | House | Referred to EDN, CPC, FIN, referral sheet 21 |
2021-03-09 | House | Pass First Reading |
2021-03-05 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 123). |
2021-03-05 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading. Ayes, 24; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 1 (Senator(s) Fevella). Transmitted to House. |
2021-03-04 | Senate | One Day Notice 03-05-21. |
2021-03-04 | Senate | Reported from JDC (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 674) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading. |
2021-02-23 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in JDC were as follows: 7 Aye(s): Senator(s) Rhoads, Keohokalole, Acasio, Gabbard, Kim, Lee, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2021-02-18 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDC will hold a public decision making on 02-23-21 9:45AM; Via Videoconference. |
2021-02-17 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading and referred to JDC. |
2021-02-17 | Senate | Reported from EDU (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 270) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading and referral to JDC. |
2021-02-08 | Senate | The committee(s) on EDU recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes in EDU were as follows: 5 Aye(s): Senator(s) Kidani, Kim, Dela Cruz, Kanuha, Fevella; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 0 Excused: none. |
2021-02-05 | Senate | The committee(s) on EDU has scheduled a public hearing on 02-08-21 3:00PM in conference room 229. |
2021-01-29 | Senate | Referred to EDU, JDC. |
2021-01-27 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2021-01-27 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1004 (Carry Over) 2021-04-23 - Conference Committee Meeting will reconvene on Friday, 04-23-21 at 5:00 PM in CR 309.