HI SB1007 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-15 - Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Mizuno, Oshiro, Takai excused (3).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 5 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-15 - Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Mizuno, Oshiro, Takai excused (3).
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Amends and clarifies the definition of "improved public lands" for the limitation of liability for public entities based on the duty to warn of dangers on public lands. (SD2)
Title
Public Land Liability; Voluntary Trails
Sponsors
Sen. Donna Kim [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-15 | House | Passed Second Reading and referred to the committee(s) on JUD with none voting aye with reservations; none voting no (0) and Mizuno, Oshiro, Takai excused (3). |
2013-03-15 | House | Reported from WAL/OMH (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 958), recommending passage on Second Reading and referral to JUD. |
2013-03-11 | House | The committees on OMH recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 7 Ayes: Representative(s) Hanohano, Cullen, Coffman, Evans, C. Lee, Lowen, Fale; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Kawakami. |
2013-03-11 | House | The committees on WAL recommend that the measure be PASSED, UNAMENDED. The votes were as follows: 8 Ayes: Representative(s) Evans, Lowen, Coffman, Cullen, Hanohano, C. Lee, Fale, Thielen; Ayes with reservations: none; Noes: none; and 1 Excused: Representative(s) Kawakami. |
2013-03-08 | House | Bill scheduled to be heard by WAL/OMH on Monday, 03-11-13 9:30AM in House conference room 325. |
2013-03-07 | House | Referred to WAL/OMH, JUD, FIN, referral sheet 30 |
2013-03-07 | House | Pass First Reading |
2013-03-05 | House | Received from Senate (Sen. Com. No. 271) in amended form (SD 2). |
2013-03-05 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). Ayes, 25; Aye(s) with reservations: none . Noes, 0 (none). Excused, 0 (none). Transmitted to House. |
2013-03-01 | Senate | 48 Hrs. Notice 03-05-13. |
2013-03-01 | Senate | Reported from WAM (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 723) with recommendation of passage on Third Reading, as amended (SD 2). |
2013-02-22 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WAM were as follows: 12 Aye(s): Senator(s) Ige, Kidani, Chun Oakland, Dela Cruz, English, Espero, Kahele, Keith-Agaran, Ruderman, Tokuda, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: Senator(s) L. Thielen ; 0 No(es): none; and 1 Excused: Senator(s) Kouchi. |
2013-02-19 | Senate | The committee(s) on WAM will hold a public decision making on 02-22-13 9:00AM in conference room 211. |
2013-02-13 | Senate | Report adopted; Passed Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referred to WAM. |
2013-02-13 | Senate | Reported from WTL/PSM/JDL (Stand. Com. Rep. No. 255) with recommendation of passage on Second Reading, as amended (SD 1) and referral to WAM. |
2013-02-05 | Senate | The committee(s) on WTL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in WTL were as follows: 4 Aye(s): Senator(s) Solomon, Shimabukuro, Dela Cruz, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 3 Excused: Senator(s) Ihara, Ruderman, L. Thielen. |
2013-02-05 | Senate | The committee(s) on JDL recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in JDL were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Hee, Shimabukuro, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Gabbard, Ihara. |
2013-02-05 | Senate | The committee(s) on PSM recommend(s) that the measure be PASSED, WITH AMENDMENTS. The votes in PSM were as follows: 3 Aye(s): Senator(s) Espero, Baker, Slom; Aye(s) with reservations: none ; 0 No(es): none; and 2 Excused: Senator(s) Galuteria, Green. |
2013-02-01 | Senate | The committee(s) on WTL/PSM/JDL has scheduled a public hearing on 02-05-13 1:35PM in conference room 225. |
2013-01-24 | Senate | Referred to WTL/PSM/JDL, WAM. |
2013-01-24 | Senate | Passed First Reading. |
2013-01-24 | Senate | Introduced. |
Same As/Similar To
HB777 (Same As) 2013-01-24 - Referred to WAL, JUD, referral sheet 5